Math Trick: Multiplication of 11! SOLVE ANY QNS OF (x11) IN 10 SECONDS!


Did you know: there is a quicker way of solving questions with multiplication of 11 even if it is 345 multiply by 11? While the digit 1-9 is easy to multiply by 11, there is a math trick for any numbers that multiply by 11!

Eg:

1 x 11 = 11

2 x 11 = 22

3 x 11 = 33

4 x 11 = 44

5 x 11 = 55

6 x 11 = 66

7 x 11 = 77

8 x 11 = 88

9 x 11 = 99

10 x 11 = 110

So how do you solve any question with a number that multiply by 11?

EXAMPLE (2 digit number x 11): 63 X 11

Step 1: Add the two digits together

62 -> 6 + 3 = 9

Step 2: Split the two digits apart and place the new number (8) in the middle.

63 x 11 = 6 9 3

EXAMPLE ( 2 digit number x 11 with carrying forward): 59 x 11

Step 1: Add the two digits together

59 -> 5 + 9 = 14

Step 2: Split the two digits apart and place the new number in the middle.

NOTE: in this case you need to carry the "1" to the 5 as there is only one blank in the middle to fill in the digit "4"

59 x 11 = 5 _ 9

= 6 4 9

Another example:

credits: student-tutor.com

Subscribe to our mailing list for more useful tips and tricks now!

To learn more about our Matrix Method and systematic approach to problem solving, simply enquire with us at achieve@pslemath.com.sg now to help your child get their desired results!

#psle #pslemath #multiplication #mathtrick #mathtuition

  • Black Facebook Icon
  • Black Twitter Icon
  • Black Instagram Icon

© Copyright 2017 by

Hiak Education Services Pte Ltd

Contact Us

Address

1 Marine Parade Central

#11-04 Singapore 449408